Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 74 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 18985 Week
» 83939 Month
» 286603 Year
» 3313456 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6135 |
m/e |
10/1932 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
61xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
278 |
To Service |
During 10/1932 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 31/12/1965 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
|
|
3w/e |
20/07/1964 |
ALLOC |
81D |
Reading (W.R.) |
3w/e |
14/09/1964 |
ALLOC |
81C |
Southall |
5w/e |
04/01/1965 |
ALLOC |
81F |
Oxford |
5w/e |
19/09/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
7w/e |
16/01/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1932 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6135 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Old Oak Common (PDN) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
10/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
19/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
31/12/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6135 |
|
|
03/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|