Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 174 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 6381 Week
» 3894 Month
» 231778 Year
» 1453343 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6141 m/e 11/1932

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 61xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 278
To Service During 11/1932
Withdrawal Fri 31/12/1965
Scrapping During 07/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 33 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1932
81C Southall 4w/e 26/03/1960
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 05/11/1960
81C Southall 5w/e 24/08/1964
82E Bristol Barrow Road 7w/e 07/11/1965
   Withdrawn 31/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 26/03/1960
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 05/11/1960
ALLOC 81C Southall 3w/e 10/08/1964
TOSTORE   5w/e 19/09/1965
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 3w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 3w/e 27/11/1965
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1422/53, 2053, 2230/33, 2414, 2805/10/25, 2915/30/34/35, 3421, 3610, 3709, 3824/48/58, 4017/19/50/89/92/99, 4248/57, 4500/24/50/74/75, 4706, 4906/09/37/63/64, 5037,91/95, 5314, 5900/06124/30/41/60/64/81, 6009/21/26, 6119/24/34/51/62/68, 6313/56/72/98, 6806/63, 6918, 7003, 7321, W.D. 77000, 78607, 79283/288. W.D. No. 77060/145/280/335, 78624 an 79244 have had their tenders removed and were taken to the stock shed on 25/3, where they are now stored. Works' pilots have been: Nos. 198, 1713/53, 2781 an 15102 PDN. New Work 30/4: 15102 PDN (being run in as Works' pilot); 6990; 9662 NPT, 9663 TN, 9664 NPT, 9665, 9666 NEA; 7008 being nearly complete. Engines condemned during April included: Nos. 302 an 3408 SLS/194806
14/10/1962 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works 1628/60, 2841/62, 3217, 3608/58, 3709/15/51/60/78, 4147, 4910/51, 5070, 5245, 5602, 6141, 6644/63/79, 6816, 6982, 7209, 8498, 9411/53, 9608/10/5/40/82. Ex-Works on shed: 9404/15; ex-Works on Oxley MPD; 4697, 7739. 'Kings' at Stafford Road minus numbers and nameplates: 6001/2/7/12/4/5/7/22. SLS/196211
15/12/1963 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) Triangle: 3653, 8425, 9425. Yard: D1060, D7092, 2818, 3668/71/6, 4111, 4555, 4690, 4987, 6000/10/25, 6159, 6831/48/9/50/9/61, 6922, 8738, 9645, 76037/76/81. Dump: 3706, 5201, 5787, 6011, 6151, 6618/31/74, 6724, 8103, 8461/91, 8791, 9401. 'A' Shop: D812/9/24/34/5/45/61, D1006/8/16/26/7/8/9/36/40/3/5/9/65, D3031, D3515/7/97, D3603/6/7, D6328, D7003/12/26/35/58, 4113/76, 5691, 6141/3, 6866, 6976/98, 7808/12/20/6, 7928, 9600/66, 73053/93, 76041, 92003. Ex-Works: 6858. Stored on Shed: 1006/27, 3842, 4631, 4924/96, 5017, 5357, 5814, 5904/43, 9604. SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1932 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6141
Built at Swindon Works
   
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
24/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
07/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 6141    

prev prev