Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 1057 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 7264 Week
» 4777 Month
» 232661 Year
» 1454226 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR (Orig) 6346 m/e 04/1923

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 216
Works Number 2891
To Service During 04/1923
Withdrawal During 09/1964
Scrapping Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 41 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1923
114 Oxley 01/01/1934
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 27/12/1958
83C Exeter 4w/e 06/10/1962
82D Westbury 4w/e 01/06/1963
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 29/06/1963
85B Gloucester Horton Road 6w/e 13/04/1964
85B Gloucester Horton Road 5w/e 24/08/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/12/1958
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road m/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 5w/e 30/03/1964
TOSTORE   3w/e 29/06/1964
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 3w/e 10/08/1964
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1949 Swindon Works New Work May: Nos. 7018 Drysllwyn Castle (originally intended to have been named Cranbrook Castle) LDR (24/5), 7019 Fowey Castle BRD (27/5), *7020 Gloucester Castle (31/5); *9682 (6/5). *Not allocated. Nos. 7018-20 are painted dark green and lined. Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle and 7022 were nearly complete on 2/6; while on the same day No. 1500 had the motion, wheels, boiler and cab erected, No. 1501 cylinders, etc., erected, No. 1502 frames only and Nos. 7023/24 frames and cylinders only. Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. p23 (Petrol), 100A1, 1017, 1419/43, 2061 (closed cab), 2212/14/61/91, 2568, 2800/03/24/76/78/90, 3010/32, 3102/64/74, 3815/24/35, 4052/58/73/82, 4224, 4377, 4516/28/39, 4676, 4805/11/55/57 (for re-conversion to coal-burning), 4903/13/33/67/91/94, 5003/09/36/43/46/60/66/93/98, 5142, 5325/62, 5406, 5503/07/43/51, 5755/75/77, 5925/34/75/82, 6000/10/11/14, 6162/63 (both fitted with deconcentrating gear), 6346/57/62/73, 6710/16/24/31, 6823/40/61/68/73, 6931/36/43, 7222, 7321, 7704/90/94, 7806/07, 8701/41, 9613, 9700/10, 70836, 90357, 1299. Condemned: Nos. 277, 2756/89 (all acting as Works pilots), 30, 280 (still retains original boiler and has round topped tanks), 3400/43, 3577 (open cab), 5117. Nos. 6105/30 have had the footsteps set further inwards. No. E1299 failed here with a hot box on 11/5, after having worked the Grimsby fish train. Nos. 2863 (ex 4805) and 2853 (ex 4810) have been re-converted to coal-burning. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1015, 4949/86 an 5973. Nos. 1015, 5074 and 6936 have received tenders with the new crest. Lining: Commencing with No. 5069 (ex Works 12/5), all locomotives painted dark green or black and fully lined are having the cylinders lined out with two red I' vertical bands at both ends. In addition No. 5069 also had the cleating bands lined, but subsequent locomotives (including No. 7018) have not had this done. SLS/194907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1923 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6346
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2891
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Oxley (114)    
27/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
01/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
24/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6346    

prev prev