Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 193 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2532 Week
» 8666 Month
» 236550 Year
» 1458115 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR (Orig) 6357 m/e 11/1923

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 216
Works Number 2902
To Service During 11/1923
Withdrawal During 07/1964
Scrapping Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 40 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1923
121 Reading (W.R.) 01/01/1934
85A Worcester 4w/e 24/04/1954
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 13/07/1957
84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 25/01/1958
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 22/02/1958
84E Tyseley 4w/e 17/05/1958
84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 18/04/1959
87G Carmarthen 4w/e 27/01/1962
87F Llanelly 4w/e 16/06/1962
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 28/09/1963
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 7w/e 22/06/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SDN Swindon 4w/e 14/06/1947
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 27/01/1962
ALLOC 87F Llanelly m/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 3w/e 29/06/1964
WDN   3w/e 20/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1953 Outside Steam Pipes fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during January included: Nos. 198, 250, 1009, 1531, 2793, 2859/80/99, 2929/51, 3011/12/44, 3800/07/09/14, 4076/83/87, 4375, 4408, 4542/61,.4854, 4917/87, 5000/01/19/22/30/33/35/48/65/69/75/91/99, 5928/39/46/58/77/94, 6000/03/17/22, 6357/80, 6821/23/62/74, 6906/32, 7001/07, 7308, 9083, W.D. 77005/58/64, 78543/714/717, 79226/34 an 79303. Engines condemned during the same period included Nos. 242, 504, an 3585. Works pilots recently have been: Nos. 198, 905, 1713, an 1781, while 3561 has been on the carriage side. New work: Nos. 6981 , 6982 and 6983 were completed on 20/1, 26/1, and 3/2 respectively; the construction of the 0-6-0 Diesel-electric shunters (Lot 364) is now under way, and the engine of the first one has been mounted on the frames. The first engine to be lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to bear the prefix 'W' in yellow paint, under the numberplate was No. 4946 , which was ex Works on 8/1 (right-hand side only) and later emerged with both sides done on 16/1. Additional locomotives leaving the Works have been dealt with in various styles, as follows: Nos. 4100, 4217, an 5514 with 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and prefixed with a yellow 'W' (Subsequently to 26/1, all prefixes have been in white paint). Nos. 1017, 4062, 4084, 4087, an 4951 were lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and prefixed 'W'; 2880, 5388, 5529, an 6736 with plain tenders and tanks and prefixed with a 'W,' while 2830 carried 'G.W.R.' on the tender and prefixed 'W.' On 23/1 No. 7007 had the old nameplates removed and was renamed Great Western, and on 30/1 No. 7001 emerged from the Works renamed Sir James Milne, with the tender bearing 'G.W.R.' and crest; the number had not been prefixed. All W.D.'s now entering the Works have had the Westinghouse pump removed, presumably at the running sheds SLS/194803
31/05/1949 Swindon Works New Work May: Nos. 7018 Drysllwyn Castle (originally intended to have been named Cranbrook Castle) LDR (24/5), 7019 Fowey Castle BRD (27/5), *7020 Gloucester Castle (31/5); *9682 (6/5). *Not allocated. Nos. 7018-20 are painted dark green and lined. Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle and 7022 were nearly complete on 2/6; while on the same day No. 1500 had the motion, wheels, boiler and cab erected, No. 1501 cylinders, etc., erected, No. 1502 frames only and Nos. 7023/24 frames and cylinders only. Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. p23 (Petrol), 100A1, 1017, 1419/43, 2061 (closed cab), 2212/14/61/91, 2568, 2800/03/24/76/78/90, 3010/32, 3102/64/74, 3815/24/35, 4052/58/73/82, 4224, 4377, 4516/28/39, 4676, 4805/11/55/57 (for re-conversion to coal-burning), 4903/13/33/67/91/94, 5003/09/36/43/46/60/66/93/98, 5142, 5325/62, 5406, 5503/07/43/51, 5755/75/77, 5925/34/75/82, 6000/10/11/14, 6162/63 (both fitted with deconcentrating gear), 6346/57/62/73, 6710/16/24/31, 6823/40/61/68/73, 6931/36/43, 7222, 7321, 7704/90/94, 7806/07, 8701/41, 9613, 9700/10, 70836, 90357, 1299. Condemned: Nos. 277, 2756/89 (all acting as Works pilots), 30, 280 (still retains original boiler and has round topped tanks), 3400/43, 3577 (open cab), 5117. Nos. 6105/30 have had the footsteps set further inwards. No. E1299 failed here with a hot box on 11/5, after having worked the Grimsby fish train. Nos. 2863 (ex 4805) and 2853 (ex 4810) have been re-converted to coal-burning. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1015, 4949/86 an 5973. Nos. 1015, 5074 and 6936 have received tenders with the new crest. Lining: Commencing with No. 5069 (ex Works 12/5), all locomotives painted dark green or black and fully lined are having the cylinders lined out with two red I' vertical bands at both ends. In addition No. 5069 also had the cleating bands lined, but subsequent locomotives (including No. 7018) have not had this done. SLS/194907
12/11/1961 Swindon Works (Outside Stock Shed) 'A' Shop: D603, D825/32/56, D1000-12, D2175-7, D2383/4, D3032, D6320, 1010/15/24, 2832, 4003/82/92/5, 4706, 4903/18/32/76/89, 5073/8/87/96/8, 5974/6, 6014/26/8, 6345, 6826/45, 6909/33/55/81, 7015/21/2/34, 7232, 7322 (being cut up), 7805, 7915, 9400, 13115, 13353/5/62, 15100, 73027, 82004/35, 92233/41/5. Works Sidings: L90, 8, 1006/23, 2215, 3838/9, 4075/83, 4207, 4945, 5071, 5950/98, 6019, 6309/29/38, 6820, 6915/64, 7002, 7901/17, 8787, 9705, 75005, 78008, 92212. Triangle: 1606/15, 4563/5, 5039, 5538, 6415, 6993, 7417, 7787, 8772, 9739. Dump: 1433, 5332, 6700, 8706, 9745/9. 'C' Shop: 6392, 7775 intact. Outside Stock Shed: 5815, 6357, 6900. Weigh House: 5938/55. Outside Weigh House: D831/53, D6303, D7010. Works Shunters: 5756/80, 7756, 8721/62. SLS/196201
27/01/1963 Wolverhampton Works (In Works) In Works: 1013/24, 1656/64, 2855, 3628(86G), 3788, 4136, 5244(86B), 6357(87C), 6692, 6975(87A), 7213, 7443, 7824, 8405/37/64, 8720, 9612/69, 9724. In Yard: 2257, 6915/6(89A), 9768. SLS/196302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1923 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6357
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2902
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Reading (W.R.) (121)    
08/1953 Modification Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
13/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
18/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J)    
27/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6357    

prev prev