Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 540 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 6747 Week
» 4260 Month
» 232144 Year
» 1453709 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR (Orig) 6390 m/e 10/1921

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3822
To Service During 10/1921
Withdrawal During 05/1962
Scrapping Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 40 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1921
32 St Philips Marsh 01/01/1934
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 01/11/1952
83B Taunton 4w/e 03/10/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   m/e 31/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1951 Outside Steam Pipes fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1921 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6390
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3822
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Philips Marsh (32)    
06/1951 Modification Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 6390    

prev prev