Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 132 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4947 Week
» 11081 Month
» 238965 Year
» 1460530 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6672 m/e 09/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 255
To Service During 09/1928
Withdrawal Wed 21/07/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 36 yrs, 10 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1928
86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 21/02/1953
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 05/09/1953
86F Tondu m/e 16/06/1956
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 14/07/1956
88B Radyr 4w/e 28/12/1963
   Withdrawn 21/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 05/09/1953
ALLOC 86F Tondu 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 88B Radyr 4w/e 31/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1928 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6672
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H)    
05/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Tondu (86F)    
14/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 6672    

prev prev