Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2766 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16172 Week
» 69188 Month
» 188715 Year
» 3215568 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6756 |
on |
29/08/1947 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
362 |
To Service |
Mon 29/08/1947 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 11/07/1960 |
Service Life |
12 yrs, 10 mths , 12 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
29/08/1947 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
11/07/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
PILL |
Newport Pill |
m/e |
31/08/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/07/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/08/1947 |
Swindon Works |
On 27/8/47 new 0-6-0T Nos. 6757-9 were under construction in the Erecting Shop. No. 6756 was complete as was 2-6-2T No. 4159. New 'Hall' Class locos. Nos. 6971-3 had the frames erected but were without cylinders. Nos. 6752/3 were also in the Erecting Shop, presumably having returned for adjustment. Nos. 6750/1 were shunting near Highworth. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/08/1947 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6756 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
11/07/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6756 |
|
|
12/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|