Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 178 Today
» 1116 Yesterday
» 178 Week
» 14435 Month
» 242319 Year
» 1463884 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6761 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 374
To Service During 11/1948 to Duffryn Yard (DYD)
Withdrawal During 01/1961
Scrapping During 04/1961 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 12 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DYD Duffryn Yard (New) m/e 11/1948
87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 8w/e 11/07/1953
87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 08/08/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/11/1948
1STALLOC DYD Duffryn Yard m/e 31/12/1948
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 08/08/1953
WDN   m/e 31/01/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1948 Swindon Works New Work November: Nos. 6761 DYD (3/11), 6762 (4/11), 6763 (10/11), 6764 (12/11), 6765 (26/11); 4169 (15/11); 6991 Acton Burnell Hall WES (22/11), 6992 Arborfield Hall (26/11); Nos. 4168 an 6760 PILL were both completed on 29/10. Locomotives entering Works 28/10/48 to 26/11/48: These included Nos. 184 (condemned), 1013/27, 1331, 1435, 1538 (condemned - at present being used as Works pilot), 1749 (condemned), *1867 (condemned), *2010, *2121, *2187, 2249, *2706, *2717 (both condemned), 2819/71/74/88/96, 2906/32/40/43/53, 3169/86, 3624/77, 3733, 3806/41/64, 3951, 4015/18/25/60/81/83/92/93, 4123, 4287, 4508/53/84, 4665/91, 4900/60, 5031/32/49/67, 5121 (condemned), 5128/77, 5345, 5406/11, 5537/44/48, 5689, 5744/72/81/94, 5801, 5926/67/89, 6021, 6146, 6382/88, 6407, 6715, 6835/43/52, 6915/35/40/47/50/59/61, 7760, 7808, 8751, **9019 (condemned), 9310, 9754, 'Austerity' 77380. *Open cab. **Fitted small 2,000 gallon tender (No. 1128 of 4/96). Nos. 6991/92 came out painted black and fully lined, While Nos. 4168/69, 6760/65 are black and unlined. The following have been painted black and fully lined:-Nos. 4966/96, 5967/92, 6922/40/50 while Nos. 1362, 2194, 2252, 2840, 3685/96, 3811, 4290, 5214, 5384, 5563, 7234, 7716/64, 8768/77, 9310 an 9711 are painted black, but not lined. Nos. 3720 an 7702 have 'G.W.R.' on the tank sides and are fitted with smokebox numberplates. No. 6009 has been fitted with a new standard cast iron smokebox num-berplate, in place of the former smaller brass one, all locomotives leaving Works are now fitted with smokebox numberplates. Locomotives noted with top feed boilers:-Nos. 3624/85/96, 5772/81, 5801, 7702/16/64, 8710/68/77, 9745. SLS/194901

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1948 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6761
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Duffryn Yard (DYD)
   
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
08/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B)    
01/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 6761    

prev prev