Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1686 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15092 Week
» 68108 Month
» 187635 Year
» 3214488 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6766 |
on |
31/01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
374 |
To Service |
Mon 31/01/1949 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 01/08/1960 |
Service Life |
11 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/08/1959 |
Swansea Paxton St. MPD (Upper Bank) |
The former LNW M.P.D. (Paxton St.) was closed w.e.f. 31st August; freight diagrams and 8F 2-8-0s have been transferred to Llanelly whilst passenger turns and the Fowler 2-6-4Ts transferred to Landore-the remaining shunting turns have been transferred to East Dock, which has taken over Upper Bank and Gurnos, the two ex-M.R. sheds. The present allocation at Upper Bank is 6700/2/14/38/63/6/7/8/73/4/8 and at Gurnos 6712/20/49/70/7. Llandovery is now sub to Llanelly. |
SLS/195910 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/01/1949 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6766 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
31/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
01/08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6766 |
|
|
12/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|