|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/07/1957 | Diesel Traction-Western Region | The first of the Derby-built diesels with cooling system for the L.M.M.R line is now in traffic-13352 arrived 8th July and is to be followed by seven more (d13353/4/5/6/7 and D3358/9) at Llanelly (87F). The present diesels at latter (d13258/9/60/1) are eventually to be sent to Cardiff E.D., where, following trials with 13104/88, five diesel shunters had arrived by 6th July (13362/3/4/5/6)-five 67XX being transferred to Swansea Paxton St. (6700/17/23/76/7). In all, 36 diesels are to be allocated to C.E.D. displacing the steam allocation by the year end. | SLS/195708 |
19/02/1961 | Swindon Works (Gas Works Sidings) | Gas Works Sidings: 1502/9, 1603/52, 3638/49, 3704, 4203, 5103/10/76, 6752/3/61/76, 7740, 8406/76, 9400/14/47/9/58, 9795. Stock Shed Yard: 1361/4, 1410/33/54, 4644, 5920, 6158, 6336, 7410/3, 7761, 8473. Triangle: 1366, 2227, 3799, 4170, 4287, 4587, 4978, 5207, 5519, 6425, 6864, 6979, 7704/76, 8457. Works Yard: 1014/25, 1625/9, 2207, 2516, 4099, 4701, 4902/15/81/5, 5025, 6003, 6131, 6945/53/61, 7000/20, 7325, 7775/94, 7902, 8454, 9481, 9701/49, 18000, 78000/8, L.T.E. L91. 'A' Shop: D604, D800/9/11/8/20/66-70, D1000-5, D2187-92, D3000/27, D3182, D6301/3/5, 7, 1017, 3806, 4073/4, 4128/31/48, 4274, 4574, 4919/24/7/30/5/54, 5008/19/27/9/32/68/71, 5900/23/72/85/6, 6023/7/9, 6122/44/7, 6368, 6822/51, 6917/29/36/51, 7033, 7908, 15100/4, 70024, 82032/9, 92232. Dump: 1601/2/10/20/59, 2813/9/32, 4550/9/94, 5331/91, 5510/4, 6333/52, 6775, 8419, 9462. 'C' Shop: 1616/44, 2846, 4281, 6382. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/11/1950 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 6776 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) | ||
20/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) | ||
05/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) | ||
12/01/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 6776 | ||
04/1961 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |