Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 235 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5579 Week
» 6469 Month
» 314450 Year
» 1198831 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6779   12/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sun 12/12/1950
Withdrawal During 06/1959
Scrapping During 12/1960 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 8 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 31/01/1951
87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) m/e 16/06/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   12/12/1950
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock w/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 19/05/1956
WDN   m/e 30/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/12/1950 To Service To service as GWR Number 6779
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 6779    
12/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev