Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 115 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 115 Week
» 6249 Month
» 234133 Year
» 1455698 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6960 on 06/03/1944

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1947 RAVENINGHAM HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class Modified Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 350
To Service Sun 06/03/1944
Withdrawal During 06/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 2 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 06/03/1944
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 03/10/1953
81F Oxford 5w/e 31/08/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 81F Oxford 5w/e 31/08/1963
WDN   2w/e 08/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1948 Swindon Works New work August: No. 7016 CDF, 7017 G. J. Churchward PDN; 7430/32 STB, 7431/33 CNYD, 7434. No. 4160 is nearing completion (26/8). Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. *100A1, 1018, 1461, 1934/57, 2144, 2340, 2746/64, 2882, 2938/39, 3613/76, 3823/25/57, *3902, *3953, 4045/85, 4119, 4269, 4552, 4671, *4802, *4850, *4852, 4902/14/20/25/28/69/76, 5006/39/63/64/84, 5107/83, 5261, 5325, 5416/20, 5540, 5756, 5932/71/80/93, 6000/08/10/22, 6311/33/85, 6433. 6746, 6849/79, 6945/60, 7206/30, 7726/82, 7800/15, 8104, **8393, 8709, 9301. *Oil-burning. **Converted to 53XX. Works' pilots of late have been: Nos. 212 (since sent for scrap, w/e 21/8), 906, 1713, 1900, 2751 SLS/194810
18/05/1963 Wolverhampton (Stafford Road) Works (In Works) In Works1424, 3607(84G), 3763, 4132/55, 4278, 4646/80, 5263, 5938/75, 6690(88J), 6900/04/16/60/88, 7210, 9790/4. Waiting Works: L92 (ex-5786), 2896, 4255, 6648. Ex Works: 8400, 6134. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/03/1944 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6960
Built at Swindon Works
   
06/1947 Naming Named 'RAVENINGHAM HALL'    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6960    

prev prev