Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 579 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 5216 Week
» 16509 Month
» 281142 Year
» 1502707 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6968 on 05/09/1944

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/1947 WOODCOCK HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class Modified Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 350
To Service Fri 05/09/1944
Withdrawal Fri 13/09/1963
Scrapping During 08/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 19 yrs , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 05/09/1944
82D Westbury 4w/e 21/05/1960
87J Fishguard Goodwick 4w/e 24/02/1962
82D Westbury 4w/e 27/07/1963
   Withdrawn on 13/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RDGw Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 09/08/1947
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 21/05/1960
ALLOC 87J Fishguard Goodwick 4w/e 24/02/1962
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 27/07/1963
WDN   4w/e 29/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1946 General The 12 noon Bristol to Paddington is always double headed (except Friday and Saturday). Locos, noted recently 6962 piloted by 5025 (15/10); 1005 piloted by 4073 (5/9); and 6968 piloted by 5019 (23/10). On 16/11 the 4.10 p.m. Paddington to Birkenhead was worked by 1003 (pilot) and 4053 SLS/194701
30/06/1949 Swindon Works (entering Works) New Work June: Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle LDR (7/6), 7022 Hereford Castle CDF (14/6), 7023 Penrice Castle CDF (23/6), *7024 Powis Castle (30/6); *1500 (22/6), 41501 (1/7). *Not allocated. Nos. 7021-24 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1500/1 are unlined black. No. 1500 has so far been tried on a variety of jobs, and it is possible that they all may go to Cardiff Docks. Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos. 1001/29, 1335/63, 1458, 2216, 2534/72, 2823/81/82/84/92, 2945, 3031/34, 3161/67, 3649, 3851, 4016/37/40/83/84, 4259, 4381, 4504/13/93, 4651, 4807/54/56 (for reconversion to coal-burning), 4961, 5008/28/52/53/82, 5151, 5303/32/61, 5510/57/58, 5760/80/92, 5800, 5910/35/40/66, 6007/20, 6105/08, 6314/35/44/70/79, 6409, 6739, 6814/21/26/63/70, 6904/20/68, 7016, 7239, 7700/10/24/28/35, 7803, 7900, 8762/98 and E1066. Condemned: 53, 1731, 2651/55, 3364, 9072. No. 7900 came in for rebalancing, while No. E1066 had a hot box. No. 2848 has been reconverted to coal-burning. No. 6000 was ex Works on 17/6 painted in the new blue and lined, with crest on the tender, while No. 6011 has also appeared in the same livery, but, as yet, has no crest on the tender. Nos. 4052/58 are ex Works painted green and lined, while further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1017/29, 6931/43 an 6936 (with the crest on the tender). Stock Shed: Nos. 4914, 5919, 6997-99 and 7902-04 have now been taken out of store and put into traffic, Nos. 4914, 6997/99 and 7902 have gone to BRD, No. 6998 to CDF and Nos. 7903/04 to PDN. SLS/194908

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/09/1944 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6968
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/1947 Naming Named 'WOODCOCK HALL'    
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Fishguard Goodwick (87J)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 6968    

prev prev