Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 77 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3096 Week
» 10280 Month
» 318261 Year
» 1202642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 70026   07/10/1952

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/10/1952 POLAR STAR

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Britannia
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 07/10/1952 to Cardiff Canton (86C)
Withdrawal Sat 14/01/1967
Scrapping Fri 14/04/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 14 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86C Cardiff Canton (New) 07/10/1952
21D Aston w/e 16/09/1961
6J Holyhead w/e 06/04/1963
9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 29/05/1965
   Withdrawn 14/01/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/10/1952
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 21D Aston 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 6J Holyhead 5w/e 04/05/1963
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 5w/e 12/06/1965
WDN   w/e 14/01/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/10/1952 To Service To service as BR Number 70026, name: POLAR STAR
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)
   
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (21D)    
06/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Holyhead (6J)    
29/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
14/01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 70026    
14/04/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev