Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 147 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3695 Week
» 4585 Month
» 312566 Year
» 1196947 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7015 m/e 09/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/1948 CARN BREA CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 09/1948 to Swindon (SDN)
Withdrawal Fri 05/04/1963 off Old Oak Common (81A)
Scrapping During 04/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 14 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Hawksworth 4,000g 4058 29/07/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4048 05/04/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4043 20/09/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2820 13/02/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4076 12/01/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4059 13/09/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2876 14/11/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2547 23/02/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2651 21/11/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2866 28/05/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2742 03/01/1962 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SDN Swindon (New) m/e 09/1948
82A Bristol Bath Road m/e 11/1955
84A Stafford Road 28/05/1959
84G Shrewsbury 04/11/1959
   Stored (Shrewsbury) 07/09/1962
81A Old Oak Common (Reinstated) 06/10/1962
   Withdrawn 05/04/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/07/1948
1STALLOC BRD Bristol Bath Road m/e 31/08/1948
ALLOC SDN Swindon 4w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC SDN Swindon 4w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road m/e 30/11/1955
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 13/06/1959
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   4w/e 06/04/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1948 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7607)
05/04/1950 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7601)
13/02/1952 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7635)
12/01/1954 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7625)
13/09/1955 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7635)
28/05/1959 Double Chimney fitted
28/05/1959 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7681)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 03/03/1950 05/04/1950 34 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7601 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4048 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
82260
Swindon Works 11/01/1952 13/02/1952 34 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7635 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2820 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
172902
Swindon Works 07/12/1953 12/01/1954 37 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7625 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4076 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
271043
Swindon Works 12/08/1955 13/09/1955 33 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7635 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4059 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
349778
Swindon Works 23/10/1956 14/11/1956 23 days Light Casual
Tender number 2876 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 27/11/1956 04/12/1956 8 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 29/06/1957 21/11/1957 146 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2651 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 26/03/1959 28/05/1959 64 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7681 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2866 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
510159
Swindon Works 28/10/1961 03/01/1962 68 days Light Intermediate
Tender number 2742 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
592197

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/07/1948 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4058    
09/1948 To Service To service as GWR Number 7015, name: CARN BREA CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Swindon (SDN)
Diagram HC boiler fitted
   
03/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 03/03/1950. Dep: 05/04/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7601 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4048 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
20/09/1951 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4043    
11/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/01/1952. Dep: 13/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7635 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2820 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/12/1953. Dep: 12/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7625 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4076 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
12/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 12/08/1955. Dep: 13/09/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7635 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4059 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
23/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/10/1956. Dep: 14/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2876 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/11/1956. Dep: 04/12/1956.    
23/02/1957 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2547    
29/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/06/1957. Dep: 21/11/1957.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2651 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
26/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 26/03/1959. Dep: 28/05/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7681 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2866 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
   
28/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
04/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
28/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 28/10/1961. Dep: 03/01/1962.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2742 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
07/09/1962 To Store To Store at Shrewsbury (89A)    
06/10/1962 Reinstated Reinstated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
05/04/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 7015 from Old Oak Common (81A)    
04/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev