|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 26/01/1951 | 01/03/1951 | 35 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 7615 (Diagram HC) |
93977 | |
Swindon Works | 21/12/1952 | 02/01/1953 | 13 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7614 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2876 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
198080 | |
Swindon Works | 22/07/1954 | 03/09/1954 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2404 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
296228 | |
Swindon Works | 15/12/1955 | 08/02/1956 | 56 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7661 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2389 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
373936 | |
Swindon Works | 14/09/1957 | 05/11/1957 | 53 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2847 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
477413 | |
Swindon Works | 02/01/1959 | 04/03/1959 | 62 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 7667 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2553 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
546287 | |
Swindon Works | 08/09/1960 | 20/10/1960 | 43 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7695 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2889 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
631225 | |
Swindon Works | 05/10/1962 | 05/12/1962 | 62 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 4013 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
707387 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1949 | Swindon Works | New Work June: Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle LDR (7/6), 7022 Hereford Castle CDF (14/6), 7023 Penrice Castle CDF (23/6), *7024 Powis Castle (30/6); *1500 (22/6), 41501 (1/7). *Not allocated. Nos. 7021-24 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1500/1 are unlined black. No. 1500 has so far been tried on a variety of jobs, and it is possible that they all may go to Cardiff Docks. Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos. 1001/29, 1335/63, 1458, 2216, 2534/72, 2823/81/82/84/92, 2945, 3031/34, 3161/67, 3649, 3851, 4016/37/40/83/84, 4259, 4381, 4504/13/93, 4651, 4807/54/56 (for reconversion to coal-burning), 4961, 5008/28/52/53/82, 5151, 5303/32/61, 5510/57/58, 5760/80/92, 5800, 5910/35/40/66, 6007/20, 6105/08, 6314/35/44/70/79, 6409, 6739, 6814/21/26/63/70, 6904/20/68, 7016, 7239, 7700/10/24/28/35, 7803, 7900, 8762/98 and E1066. Condemned: 53, 1731, 2651/55, 3364, 9072. No. 7900 came in for rebalancing, while No. E1066 had a hot box. No. 2848 has been reconverted to coal-burning. No. 6000 was ex Works on 17/6 painted in the new blue and lined, with crest on the tender, while No. 6011 has also appeared in the same livery, but, as yet, has no crest on the tender. Nos. 4052/58 are ex Works painted green and lined, while further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1017/29, 6931/43 an 6936 (with the crest on the tender). Stock Shed: Nos. 4914, 5919, 6997-99 and 7902-04 have now been taken out of store and put into traffic, Nos. 4914, 6997/99 and 7902 have gone to BRD, No. 6998 to CDF and Nos. 7903/04 to PDN. | SLS/194908 |
30/12/1962 | Western Regionboundary changes | The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. | SLS/196303 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/06/1949 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 7024, name: POWIS CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g Diagram HC boiler fitted |
||
26/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/01/1951. Dep: 01/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7615 (Diagram HC) |
||
21/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 21/12/1952. Dep: 02/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7614 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2876 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
22/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/07/1954. Dep: 03/09/1954. Work undertaken: Tender number 2404 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 15/12/1955. Dep: 08/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7661 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2389 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/09/1957. Dep: 05/11/1957. Work undertaken: Tender number 2847 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/01/1959. Dep: 04/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7667 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2553 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
||
08/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/09/1960. Dep: 20/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7695 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2889 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/01/1961 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2909 | ||
18/08/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A) | ||
05/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/10/1962. Dep: 05/12/1962. Work undertaken: Tender number 4013 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
09/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxley (2B) | ||
13/02/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 7024 from Oxley (2B) | ||
05/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |