Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 235 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5579 Week
» 6469 Month
» 314450 Year
» 1198831 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7031 m/e 06/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1950 CROMWELL'S CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 06/1950 to Laira (83D)
Withdrawal Tue 16/07/1963 off Worcester (85A)
Scrapping During 06/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 13 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Hawksworth 4,000g 4102 20/06/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2754 24/04/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 4012 11/09/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4115 27/04/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2779 13/08/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2419 08/10/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4074 24/04/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2549 31/01/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2629 25/01/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2658 14/05/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2927 05/09/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2558 05/01/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2417 09/02/1962 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83D Laira (New) m/e 06/1950
83B Taunton 31/01/1957
83D Laira 24/03/1959
82C Swindon 05/01/1960
85A Worcester 24/03/1962
   Withdrawn 16/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 15/07/1950
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 24/03/1962
WDN   20/07/1963
WDN   4w/e 27/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1950 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7628)
11/09/1953 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7621)
31/01/1957 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7606)
05/01/1960 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7600)
09/02/1962 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 6699)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 11/03/1952 24/04/1952 45 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2754 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
112844
Swindon Works 07/08/1953 11/09/1953 36 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7621 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4012 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
203795
Swindon Works 11/03/1955 27/04/1955 48 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 4115 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
311895
Swindon Works 04/04/1956 24/04/1956 21 days Unclassified
Tender number 4074 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 21/11/1956 31/01/1957 72 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7606 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2549 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
311895
Swindon Works 01/04/1958 14/05/1958 44 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2658 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
410792
Swindon Works 23/10/1959 05/01/1960 75 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7600 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2558 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
593448
Swindon Works 02/08/1960 26/08/1960 25 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 30/11/1961 09/02/1962 72 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6699 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2417 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
669308

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1950 To Service To service as GWR Number 7031, name: CROMWELL'S CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
Diagram HC boiler fitted
   
20/06/1950 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4102    
11/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/03/1952. Dep: 24/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2754 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 07/08/1953. Dep: 11/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7621 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4012 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/03/1955. Dep: 27/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4115 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
13/08/1955 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2779    
08/10/1955 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2419    
04/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/04/1956. Dep: 24/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4074 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
21/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 21/11/1956. Dep: 31/01/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7606 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2549 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
31/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
25/01/1958 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2629    
01/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/04/1958. Dep: 14/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2658 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
05/09/1959 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2927    
23/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 23/10/1959. Dep: 05/01/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7600 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2558 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
02/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/08/1960. Dep: 26/08/1960.    
30/11/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 30/11/1961. Dep: 09/02/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6699 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2417 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
16/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 7031 from Worcester (85A)    
06/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev