Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 325 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 325 Week
» 7509 Month
» 315490 Year
» 1199871 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 73031 m/e 07/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 5
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 07/1953 to Derby (17A)
Withdrawal During 09/1965
Scrapping During 12/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 12 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
17A Derby (New) m/e 07/1953
22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 16/06/1957
   Unknown - please contact administrator! 4w/e 25/01/1958
82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 02/12/1961
85C Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 21/04/1962
85B Gloucester Horton Road 3w/e 04/05/1964
81F Oxford 4w/e 11/07/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 66A Polmadie w/e 03/07/1953
LOAN 17A Derby 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 15/06/1957
LOAN RTP   4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 02/12/1961
ALLOC 85C Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 21/04/1962
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 3w/e 04/05/1964
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 11/07/1965
WDN   25/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1953 To Service To service as BR Number 73031
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
25/01/1958 Allocation      
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F)    
21/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (85C)    
04/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 73031    
12/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev