Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 546 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 13952 Week
» 66968 Month
» 186495 Year
» 3213348 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73042 |
on |
27/10/1953 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/10/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73042 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
26/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G) |
|
|
18/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
03/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G) |
|
|
08/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73042 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|