Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 36 Today
» 1116 Yesterday
» 36 Week
» 14293 Month
» 242177 Year
» 1463742 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 73065 m/e 10/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 5
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 10/1954 to Sheffield Millhouses (19B)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/07/1967
Scrapping During 03/1968 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 12 yrs, 9 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
19B Sheffield Millhouses (New) m/e 10/1954
41D Canklow w/e 06/01/1962
71A Eastleigh w/e 08/12/1962
70B Feltham m/e 06/01/1964
70A Nine Elms w/e 20/11/1964
70C Guildford 4w/e 08/06/1965
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 27/06/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 16/10/1954
LOAN 41C Sheffield Millhouses 01/02/1958
ALLOC 41C Sheffield Millhouses 23/02/1958
ALLOC 41D Canklow 01/01/1962
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh P 17/12/1962
ALLOC 70B Feltham 4w/e 29/12/1963
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 2w/e 20/11/1964
ALLOC 70C Guildford P 06/06/1965
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 27/06/1966
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/12/1954 York MPD Fort William shed is not often represented at York, but on 14/12/54 62031 (K1-63D) was at York shed after a visit to Doncaster Works. 67745 (L1-34D) was at York on 15/12/54 after a visit to Darlington, and 67780 (L1-34E) in similar circumstances on 31/12/54. On 20/12/54 new BR Standard 2-6-4T 80113. from Doncaster Works was at York, en route for the Scottish Region, and fitted with tablet exchange apparatus. On the same date a surprising arrival at York was 69369 (N5-34E), en route for Darlington Works for repair owing to an alleged surplus of repair work at Gorton with a corresponding shortage at Darlington. 69369 was apparently overcome by its long journey, as a hot bearing developed necessitating attention at York shed; it reappeared in York shed yard on 30/12/54. 63755 (O1-54B), fitted with additional pumps for the Tyne Dock-Consett working, was also at York on the same date. On 28/12/54 46469 (30E) was at York after a visit to Darlington Works. 44669 (68A) worked the Holbeck duty on the 9.22 a.m. Leeds City-Scarborough, etc., on 28/12/54, and the same duty was taken on 30/12/54 by 44792 (68A). 73066 (20A) has continued appearances on this turn, while 73065 (19B) has also visited York on Millhouses turns, particularly the 10.20 a.m. Bristol-Newcastle. On 29/12/54 the 3.55 p.m. relief arrival at York from Birmingham (New Street) was worked by 42756 (17B). On 31/12/54 new BR Standard 2-6-2T 82029 was at York on arrival in the North Eastern Region from Swindon. Ex-Works engines on shed or this date also included 61215, (B1-53B), 67780 (L1-34E), and 90382 (AY-53A). SLS/195501
23/04/1961 Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. SLS/196106
31/12/1961 Millhouses closure Millhouses M.P.D. (41C) was closed as from 31/12/61 and its allocation of locomotives distributed as follows : 41209/45/6, 43037, 45570/6/90/4, 45602/7/27/54/6/64/83/725, 45536, 46131/47/8/51/4, 46450, 61083/93, 61820/2, 73016/65/155 all to Canklow (41D); 78022/3/4/5 to Doncaster (36A). SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 73065
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B)
   
06/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
20/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
08/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
27/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
09/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 73065    

prev prev