Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2063 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19866 Week
» 72882 Month
» 192409 Year
» 3219262 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73094 |
on |
10/11/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/08/1961 |
Bristol Barrow Road |
45572/7, 45651/60/90/9 have been allocated to Shrewsbury whilst from latter 73094 is to go to Barrow Road and 73091/2/3 to Gloucester Barnwood. |
SLS/196110 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/11/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73094 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) |
|
|
02/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (85C) |
|
|
23/05/1964 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Shrewsbury (6D) |
|
|
24/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (9H) |
|
|
13/05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73094 |
|
|
28/02/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|