Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 263 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7723 Week
» 5236 Month
» 233120 Year
» 1454685 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 73110 m/e 10/1956

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1956 THE RED KNIGHT

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 5
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 10/1956 to Nine Elms (70A)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 29/01/1967
Scrapping During 06/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 10 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
70A Nine Elms (New) m/e 10/1956
70D Eastleigh m/e 14/09/1964
70C Guildford 4w/e 25/10/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 29/01/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 70A Nine Elms 05/10/1955
LOAN 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 25/10/1965
WDN   w/e 29/01/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/01/1960 Eastleigh Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: 30056/108/516/33/40/86/668/73/7/87/9/950, 34006/63/86/106/10, 35004, 41291, 73110/15, 75079, 78005/56, 80013, E5001. Ex-works: 32106, 34099, 84029, E20003. Waiting works: 30035/475, 34067, 80089; on 'dump', 30179/318/774. SLS/196002
07/09/1963 Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: 30073, 30824, 33037, 34006/15/21/33/41/51, 34043 partially cut up, 35014/7/8/25/7, 41316/24, 73049/51, 75069, 76010/28/68, 80015/31/42/82, D3668, D4100, D6536/45, E5007, E6001. Test House: 31834. Scrap Yard: 30510, 30911. Works Yard: 35010, WD601 ex works, 31400, 31846, 34036 damaged front end, 34055 (with smoke-box door from 34043), 35029, 73110 (all waiting works), 30915, 31818, 32338, 32635/61 waiting scrap. SLS/196310

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 73110, name: THE RED KNIGHT
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Nine Elms (70A)
   
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
25/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
29/01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 73110    

prev prev