Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 173 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1272 Week
» 7406 Month
» 235290 Year
» 1456855 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 73113 m/e 10/1956

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1956 LYONNESSE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 5
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 10/1956 to Nine Elms (70A)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 22/01/1967
Scrapping During 05/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 10 yrs, 3 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
70A Nine Elms (New) m/e 10/1956
70D Eastleigh m/e 14/09/1964
70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 25/10/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 22/01/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 70A Nine Elms 26/10/1955
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 25/10/1965
WDN   w/e 22/01/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/11/1961 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: D5006, D6530/63, 15211, 30065, 30120, 30782, 32349, 34072, 34103, 35006, 41275. Erecting Shop: D3460/2, D5003/11, 3798, 4616/26, 7782, 9629, 30057, 30531, 31808, 32343, 33023/33/40, 34007/15/6/33/57/94, 34110, 35008/9/10/8, 41206/16/70, 41301/24, 73018/20, 73113, 75079, 76059, 80154, 92239. Scrap Yard: 30023/59, 30247, 30584, 30858/9, 30918 intact. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 73113, name: LYONNESSE
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Nine Elms (70A)
   
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
25/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (70G)    
22/01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 73113    

prev prev