Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1707 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19510 Week
» 72526 Month
» 192053 Year
» 3218906 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73115 |
on |
15/11/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
70D |
Eastleigh |
4w/e |
14/09/1964 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
4w/e |
27/06/1966 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
4w/e |
17/10/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/03/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/01/1960 |
Eastleigh Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop: 30056/108/516/33/40/86/668/73/7/87/9/950, 34006/63/86/106/10, 35004, 41291, 73110/15, 75079, 78005/56, 80013, E5001. Ex-works: 32106, 34099, 84029, E20003. Waiting works: 30035/475, 34067, 80089; on 'dump', 30179/318/774. |
SLS/196002 |
12/08/1967 |
Salisbury MPD |
On 12th August, the following locomotives were in store at Salisbury (70E): USA 0-6-0T 30064/7/9/71/2, W/C Pacific 34102, WC/BB Pacific (Reb.) 34018/21/4/5/37/40/56/60/87/9/90/8, 34104/8, LMS 2-6-2T 41312/9, BR 5MT 4-6-0 73022/9/43/65/85/93, 73115/7/8/55, BR 4MT 4-6-0 75074/5/7, BR 4MT 2-6-0 76005/6/7/11/31/64/6/7, BR 4MT 2-6-4T 80015/6/133/9/40/3/5/6/51/2 and BR 3MT 2-6-2T 82019/29. |
SLS/196709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/11/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73115, name: KING PELLINORE Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
14/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
27/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
17/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
19/03/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73115 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|