Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 348 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3896 Week
» 4786 Month
» 312767 Year
» 1197148 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 73117 m/e 11/1956

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/1956 VIVIEN

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 5
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 11/1956 to Nine Elms (70A)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 19/03/1967
Scrapping During 08/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 10 yrs, 4 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
70A Nine Elms (New) m/e 11/1956
70D Eastleigh m/e 14/09/1964
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 27/06/1966
70C Guildford 4w/e 17/10/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 19/03/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 70A Nine Elms 28/11/1955
LOAN 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 27/06/1966
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 17/10/1966
WDN   w/e 19/03/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1956 To Service To service as BR Number 73117, name: VIVIEN
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Nine Elms (70A)
   
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
27/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
17/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
03/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 73117    
08/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev