Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 112 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 112 Week
» 7296 Month
» 315277 Year
» 1199658 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 73155 m/e 12/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 5
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 12/1956 to Neasden (34E)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/07/1967
Scrapping During 03/1968 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 10 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
34E Neasden (New) m/e 12/1956
41C Sheffield Millhouses 4w/e 10/05/1958
41D Canklow w/e 06/01/1962
71A Eastleigh w/e 08/12/1962
70B Feltham m/e 06/01/1964
70D Eastleigh w/e 20/11/1964
70C Guildford 5w/e 17/04/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 14D Neasden 01/02/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden 23/02/1958
ALLOC 41C Sheffield Millhouses 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 41D Canklow 01/01/1962
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh P 17/12/1962
ALLOC 70B Feltham 4w/e 29/12/1963
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 2w/e 20/11/1964
ALLOC 70C Guildford 5w/e 17/04/1967
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1956 To Service To service as BR Number 73155
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Neasden (34E)
   
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C)    
06/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
20/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
17/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 73155    
03/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev