Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 282 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7742 Week
» 5255 Month
» 233139 Year
» 1454704 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 73159 m/e 01/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 5
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 01/1957 to Neasden (34E)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 28/10/1967
Scrapping During 03/1968 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 10 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
34E Neasden (New) m/e 01/1957
34A Kings Cross 4w/e 09/11/1957
41A Sheffield Darnall 5w/e 15/11/1958
14D Neasden w/e 27/12/1958
17A Derby w/e 21/02/1959
14D Neasden w/e 18/06/1960
15E Leicester (G.C.) w/e 30/06/1962
2F Woodford Halse w/e 12/01/1963
5E Nuneaton w/e 19/09/1964
9H Patricroft w/e 24/07/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 28/10/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 34E Neasden 11/01/1957
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 01/11/1958
LOAN 14D Neasden 4w/e 27/12/1958
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 24/01/1959
ALLOC 14D Neasden 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 14D Neasden 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 15E Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 4w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 5E Nuneaton 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 9H Patricroft 4w/e 07/08/1965
WDN 9H Patricroft w/e 28/10/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/02/1959 Derby Works (Erecting shop, 1 bay) Paint shop-40563I, 43924G, 44606G, 47341G, 48538G, 73038G, 80066G, D5011 new. D/E Erecting shop-10000/1, 10203, 10800, 12000, 12082, 13083, 13169, D3568, D8014, new work-D3763-D3767 new. Outside-dED2. Test House-D5009/10. Erecting shop, 1 bay- 42374G, 42501G, 42520I, 44216I, 44518I, 47223G, 47379G, 47405G, 48003G, 48010G, 48317I, 48367G, 48409I, 73126I, 73159I, 75056G, 80088G, 42409 an 47376 stripping. Erecting shop, 2 bay- 42136I, 44477I, 48011I, 73125I, 73128I, 48050 stripping. Erecting shop, 3 bay- 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D/E D5012-8 new, 4 1Co-Col 2300 H.P. D/Es, D5008. Yard- 40047, 40680, 42354, 43946, 43970, 47309, 48364 frames, 48517, 10100, D2910, D8001. SLS/195903
15/10/1959 Derby Works (Yard) Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42512 (I), 42624 (G), 47598 (G), 48001 (I), 48218 (G), 48293 (I), D3791 New, D5025 New. Diesel Erecting Shop: 10203, 11126, 12036, 13038. New Work: 9 D-E. Sh. D3792-D3800new. Test House: D6, D3789/90. Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026/7/8, D4. Erecting Shop; No. 1 Bay; 42314 (G), 42403 (I), 42405 (I), 42422 (G), 42506 (I), 42523 (I), 42537 (G), 43914 (I), 44333 (I), 44435 (I), 44521 (I), 44557 (G), 47410 (G), 48004 (G), 73030 (I), 80093 (G). Stripping: 42311, 43865, 48674stripping. Erecting Shop; No. 2 Bay: 42227 (I), 42540 (G), 43949 (G), 44262 (G), 44267 casual, 44394 (G), 48331 (I), 75044 (I). Erecting Shop; No. 3 Bay: 9 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. D-E. D5029-37uc 5 1-Co-Co-1. 2300 H.P. D-E D7-11uc. Yard: 40047, 40412, 40513/36/50/680, 42303/13/41/54, 43292/308/587/826 860/86, 44214/402, 47309/433/584/632, 48050, 58065, 73159, 10000/800, 12094, D2/5, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195911
16/10/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D6, D211, D312, D2908/9/13, D5084/9, 10203, 11146. Diesel Test House: D3, D138/9, D226, 11145, 12100. Shunter Test House: 12096. New Building: D142-D151. Finishing Shop: D76, D140/1, D5024, D8000. Erecting Shop: D3578, 12078, 13122/3, 42198, 42368, 42421, 44172/8, 44213/94, 44436, 47250, 47350/88/99, 48001/53/7, 48356, 48439, 58850 frames only, 73073, 73137/59, 75015/30/5. Paint Shop: 42408, 44185, 48491, 73010. In Works Sidings: ED3, D1, D10, D43, D75, D89, D2501, D5143, 10202, 12000/54, 41168, 41804, 42328, 42404, 42510/21/4, 43295, 43593, 43905, 44033, 44232/48, 47218/68/98, 47529, 47666, 48009/10, 48185, 48380, 73158, 75017, 92059. SLS/196111
05/11/1961 Derby MPD (17A) (Ex-Works on shed) Ex-Works on shed: D138 new, D2507, 43932, 44178, 44248/94, 44433, 47250, 47327/88, 48010/53/7, 73159, 75035. SLS/196112
10/08/1962 Derby Works (Stone Pit) Diesel Erecting Shop: D48, D104, D132, D179, D5000/80, 10001. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: ED3, D5, D178, D3125, D5017. Test House: D90, D122, D176, D5018, Pullman Coach No. uM60090. Shunter Test House: D3121. New Building: D183-D192. Finishing Shop: D68, D108, D180-D182, D5022. Erecting Shop: D2386, D3117/77, 12054, 42240/7, 42335, 42413, 44321, 44575, 48000, 48132, 48673, 48759, 73161/5. Paint Shop: D177, MR1000. Outside Paint Shop: 43994. 'Stone Pit': 73159, 75063. 'Foundry Row': 42069, 42500, 43216, 43682, 44122, 73131. 'Klondyke Sidings' : D58, D87, D96, D5014/28, D5134, 10201/3, 73137 (frames only). SLS/196209
07/09/1962 Derby MPD Ex Works on Shed: D3121 (18A), D5000 (1A), D5141 (1A), 42075, 42413 (55G), 73090 (89A), 73159 (15E), 73163 (55G), 73167 (55E). 70046 (21D) was on shed and 48623 (2B) was noted on a West bound freight. SLS/196210
12/03/1963 Derby Works (Works yard) D42, D78, D82, D99, D107, D117/9, D120/1, D5027/88, D5393. Outside: D5002/18, D5189. Test House: D48, D113/8, D3372, D5136/87/8/91/2/3. Diesel Finishing Shop: D70, D5010, D5194/5/6. Paint Shop: D5190. Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 43637, 44393, 48619, 73045, 75061, D8, D2913, D3020, D5012, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay: D54, D109, D5083/4; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay: D5197-D5210 new. Works yard: 40026, 42392/422/72/500, 42784, 44004/112, 44228 frames, 44519, 47003, 47276, 58138, 73159, u60093, D64, D94, D111, D130, D5005/31. Stored outside Works offices: 10000/201/2/3. SLS/196304
30/04/1963 Oswestry Works (Works yard) Oswestry Works in April contained ex GSWR 0-6-0T ex Hafod Colliery (NBL 21621 of 1917). SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 73159
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Neasden (34E)
   
09/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
27/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (14D)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (14D)    
30/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E)    
12/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
19/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E)    
24/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (9H)    
28/10/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 73159    

prev prev