Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 567 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6376 Week
» 13560 Month
» 321541 Year
» 1205922 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 73167 m/e 04/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 5
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 04/1957 to York (North) (50A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/08/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 8 yrs, 4 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
50A York (North) (New) m/e 04/1957
50E Scarborough w/e 31/01/1959
55E Normanton w/e 20/06/1959
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 22/06/1963
70B Feltham w/e 14/09/1963
6D Shrewsbury w/e 15/08/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 07/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 50A York (North) 13/04/1957
ALLOC 50E Scarborough 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 55E Normanton 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 55A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region w/e 14/09/1963
ALLOC 70B Feltham 4w/e 16/09/1963
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 07/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1957 To Service To service as BR Number 73167
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to York (North) (50A)
   
31/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Scarborough (50E)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
15/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 73167    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev