Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 4448 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23359 Week
» 88313 Month
» 290977 Year
» 3317830 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73171 |
on |
24/05/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/05/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73171 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
21/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (55D) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
20/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
02/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73171 |
|
|
03/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|