|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/03/1961 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: 32107, 34078, 35007/26, 76059/62. Erecting Shop: D2274, D3465, E5004/6/17, 15233, 30106, 30254, 30501/6/13/20, 30667, 30863, 32300, 32662, 34062/96/7, 34108, 35016/7/20, 41318, 73019, 73117, 75066/71, 76007/65, 80018/43/81, 82015, Longmoor Military Rly. 600. Behind Boiler Shop: 15202/28, 30826. Scrap Road: 30031, 30128. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
0000 | Tender | Tender fitted: BR1B number 1030 | ||
01/09/1955 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 75066 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) | ||
06/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
17/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) | ||
01/04/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
02/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 75066 | ||
04/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |