Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 1026 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 6247 Week
» 21361 Month
» 324551 Year
» 1546116 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75069 on 28/09/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 409
To Service Sun 28/09/1955 to Dover Marine (74C)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 25/09/1966
Service Life 10 yrs, 11 mths , 28 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR1B 1033 28/09/1955 BR 4,725g 7t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
74C Dover Marine (New) on 28/09/1955
71B Bournemouth 6w/e 14/06/1959
73A Stewarts Lane 5w/e 26/11/1959
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 19/08/1963
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 08/06/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 25/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/09/1955
NEW 74C Dover Marine 3w/e 10/10/1955
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane P 26/11/1959
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 8w/e 19/08/1963
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh P 06/06/1965
WDN   w/e 25/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/09/1963 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 30073, 30824, 33037, 34006/15/21/33/41/51, 34043 partially cut up, 35014/7/8/25/7, 41316/24, 73049/51, 75069, 76010/28/68, 80015/31/42/82, D3668, D4100, D6536/45, E5007, E6001. Test House: 31834. Scrap Yard: 30510, 30911. Works Yard: 35010, WD601 ex works, 31400, 31846, 34036 damaged front end, 34055 (with smoke-box door from 34043), 35029, 73110 (all waiting works), 30915, 31818, 32338, 32635/61 waiting scrap. SLS/196310

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/09/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75069
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Dover Marine (74C)
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
26/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
19/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
08/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
25/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 75069    

prev prev