Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2275 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20078 Week
» 73094 Month
» 192621 Year
» 3219474 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
75070 |
on |
13/10/1955 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
BR1B |
1034 |
13/10/1955 |
BR |
4,725g |
7t 0cwt |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: BR1B number 1034 |
|
|
13/10/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 75070 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
15/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (71G) |
|
|
01/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
11/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
09/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
24/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D) |
|
|
19/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
08/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
11/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 75070 |
|
|
03/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|