|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eastleigh Works | 03/04/1956 | 14/04/1956 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 18/11/1957 | 14/12/1957 | 27 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 01/04/1959 | 11/04/1959 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 02/06/1960 | 25/06/1960 | 24 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 10/05/1963 | 15/06/1963 | 37 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 14/01/1964 | 21/05/1955 | -3159 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/05/1963 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/06/1953 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 76018 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
||
03/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/04/1956. Dep: 14/04/1956. | ||
18/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1957. Dep: 14/12/1957. | ||
01/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/04/1959. Dep: 11/04/1959. | ||
10/03/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) | ||
02/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 02/06/1960. Dep: 25/06/1960. | ||
10/05/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1963. Dep: 15/06/1963. | ||
14/01/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 14/01/1964. Dep: 21/05/1955. | ||
14/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) | ||
27/06/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Guildford (70C) | ||
02/10/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 76018 | ||
06/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |