Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1050 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14456 Week
» 67472 Month
» 186999 Year
» 3213852 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76023 |
m/e |
12/1952 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/08/1962 |
Aston MPD |
B.R. Standard Class 4s 76020/2/3/51 have been transferred here from Springs Branch (replaced there by WDs) and are working local goods trips. |
SLS/196209 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76023 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Sunderland (54A) |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
21/07/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (51H) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J) |
|
|
06/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G) |
|
|
21/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (21D) |
|
|
22/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
12/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Uttoxeter (5F) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76023 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|