Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 179 Today
» 911 Yesterday
» 179 Week
» 14083 Month
» 322064 Year
» 1206445 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 76043 m/e 08/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 08/1954 to Neasden (34E)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/09/1966
Scrapping During 12/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 12 yrs, 1 mth , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
34E Neasden (New) m/e 08/1954
14A Cricklewood East w/e 07/07/1962
2E Saltley w/e 01/08/1964
6F Machynlleth w/e 18/06/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 10/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 34E Neasden 12/08/1954
LOAN 14D Neasden 01/02/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden 23/02/1958
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 2E Saltley 4w/e 08/08/1964
ALLOC 6F Machynlleth 4w/e 09/07/1966
WDN   w/e 10/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1954 To Service To service as BR Number 76043
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Neasden (34E)
   
07/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
01/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (2E)    
18/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (6F)    
09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 76043    
12/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev