Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2054 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19857 Week
» 72873 Month
» 192400 Year
» 3219253 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76048 |
on |
25/03/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/03/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76048 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
22/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (51H) |
|
|
11/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J) |
|
|
25/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Skipton (24G) |
|
|
30/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
25/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
10/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C) |
|
|
04/02/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76048 |
|
|
07/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|