Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 394 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18197 Week
» 71213 Month
» 190740 Year
» 3217593 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76056 |
on |
14/05/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
75B |
Redhill |
w/e |
13/06/1955 |
ALLOC |
71B |
Bournemouth |
P |
26/11/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/11/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/05/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76056 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
26/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
31/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
07/11/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76056 |
|
|
03/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|