Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 1026 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18829 Week
» 71845 Month
» 191372 Year
» 3218225 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76074 |
on |
02/11/1956 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
65A |
Eastfield |
on |
02/11/1956 |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
4w/e |
26/08/1961 |
ALLOC |
65F |
Grangemouth |
2w/e |
21/10/1961 |
ALLOC |
65D |
Dawsholm |
4w/e |
09/11/1963 |
ALLOC |
67E |
Dumfries |
6w/e |
07/11/1964 |
ALLOC |
67C |
Ayr |
5w/e |
12/03/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/10/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/11/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76074 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
26/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
31/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dumfries (67E) |
|
|
26/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
19/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76074 |
|
|
01/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|