Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 182 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17985 Week
» 71001 Month
» 190528 Year
» 3217381 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76111 |
on |
20/08/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/08/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76111 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
07/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
28/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76111 |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|