Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 90 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 6146 Week
» 20723 Month
» 383968 Year
» 460555 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 77010   10/06/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 3
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Thu 10/06/1954 to Darlington (51A)
Withdrawal Thu 25/11/1965
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Arnott Young (Parkgate)
Service Life 11 yrs, 5 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
51A Darlington (New) 10/06/1954
51F West Auckland 3w/e 14/08/1954
51A Darlington 4w/e 18/06/1955
53B Hull Botanic Gardens 4w/e 16/07/1955
53C Hull Springhead w/e 11/10/1958
53A Hull Dairycoates 01/12/1958
51L Thornaby w/e 14/04/1962
51F West Auckland w/e 27/04/1963
55B Stourton 02/02/1964
   Withdrawn 25/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 51A Darlington 10/06/1954
NEW NYA   m/e 30/06/1954
ALLOC 51F West Auckland 4w/e 14/08/1954
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 18/06/1955
ALLOC 53B Hull Botanic Gardens 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 01/12/1958
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 51F West Auckland 6w/e 11/05/1963
ALLOC 55B Stourton 4w/e 08/02/1964
WDN   25/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/06/1954 To Service To service as BR Number 77010
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Darlington (51A )
   
14/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (51F)    
18/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)    
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
01/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
14/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
27/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (51F)    
02/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stourton (55B)    
25/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 77010    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate    

prev prev