Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 603 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19514 Week
» 84468 Month
» 287132 Year
» 3313985 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
7721 |
m/e |
06/1930 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Kerr Stuart |
Order Number |
279 |
Works Number |
4456 |
To Service |
During 06/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 13/07/1962 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 1 mth , 12 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
86H |
Aberbeeg |
4w/e |
20/05/1950 |
ALLOC |
86B |
Newport Pill |
4w/e |
08/09/1951 |
ALLOC |
86K |
Tredegar |
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
ALLOC |
86B |
Newport Pill |
4w/e |
21/05/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/07/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 7721 Built at Kerr Stuart, Works Number 4456 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Llantrisant (LTS) |
|
|
20/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
30/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
21/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tredegar (86K) |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
13/07/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7721 |
|
|
09/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|