Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4130 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17536 Week
» 70552 Month
» 190079 Year
» 3216932 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
7738 |
m/e |
01/1930 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1959 |
Swindon Works (Scrapyard) |
Scrapyard1401/23/9/37/56/7/57, 2254, 2812/23/5/30/3, 4200/26/61, 4377, 4540/53/84, 5315/55/82/6/8/90, 5566, 5703/8/33/43, 5810, 6318/22/8/31/4/54, 6409/28, 6721/3/7/43, 7738. |
SLS/195907 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 7738 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23934 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Old Oak Common (PDN) |
|
|
23/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (RYR) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
12/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
16/02/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7738 |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|