Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1967 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15373 Week
» 68389 Month
» 187916 Year
» 3214769 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
7739 |
m/e |
01/1930 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1970 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1930 |
NEA |
|
Neath (Court Sart) |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
04/11/1962 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/08/1962 |
Wolverhampton Works (In Works) |
In Works: 1020, 1630, 3615, 3721, 4636, 4697, 4703, 5181/4, 5564, 6160, 6614/8, 7739, 7816, 8104, 9422/70, 9613/24/6/47/65, 82008; Weigh house: 6156; Awaiting works: 3217, 4938/61, 5065, 5658, 7002, 7824, 9415. |
SLS/196209 |
14/10/1962 |
Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works (Oxley MPD) |
1628/60, 2841/62, 3217, 3608/58, 3709/15/51/60/78, 4147, 4910/51, 5070, 5245, 5602, 6141, 6644/63/79, 6816, 6982, 7209, 8498, 9411/53, 9608/10/5/40/82. Ex-Works on shed: 9404/15; ex-Works on Oxley MPD; 4697, 7739. 'Kings' at Stafford Road minus numbers and nameplates: 6001/2/7/12/4/5/7/22. |
SLS/196211 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 7739 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23935 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neath (Court Sart) (NEA ) |
|
|
04/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7739 |
|
|
01/1970 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|