Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 160 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17963 Week
» 70979 Month
» 190506 Year
» 3217359 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
7741 |
m/e |
02/1930 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
23937 |
To Service |
During 02/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 03/12/1961 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys |
Information |
On withdrawal from BR, this locomotive worked for the London Transport Executive as L96 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1967 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
OFFSTOCK |
UNK |
|
on |
03/12/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/02/1961 |
Lydney MPD |
On shed on 18th February-1623/7/31/2/42, 2289, 3721, 6415, 7741 whilst 6394 was stored-the latter used to work the Stoke Gifford goods via the Severn Bridge till latter was damaged. |
SLS/196104 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 7741 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23937 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gloucester Horton Road (GLO) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
30/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
03/12/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7741 |
|
|
03/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) (Probable transfer to Neasden as LT L96) |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|