Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 407 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18210 Week
» 71226 Month
» 190753 Year
» 3217606 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
7744 |
m/e |
02/1930 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1930 |
DYD |
|
Duffryn Yard |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
88E |
|
Abercynon |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
27/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88E |
Abercynon |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 7744 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23940 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Duffryn Yard (DYD) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
09/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
27/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7744 |
|
|