Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 102 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 3701 Week
» 9835 Month
» 237719 Year
» 1459284 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7755 m/e 12/1930

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 24043
To Service During 12/1930
Withdrawal During 05/1962
Scrapping During 09/1962 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 31 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1930
87G Carmarthen 8w/e 11/07/1953
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 21/04/1956
86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 31/10/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 20/05/1950
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 17/06/1950
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 21/04/1956
ALLOC 86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 31/10/1959
WDN   m/e 31/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1930 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 7755
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24043
   
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H)    
05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 7755    

prev prev