01/04/1961 |
Ashchurch |
On 1st April, 7788 worked the Upton service with one coach and 8426 worked the 1-5 p.m. (SO) to Redditch. 7756 was on Tewkesbury shed. |
SLS/196105 |
23/07/1961 |
Swindon Works (Works Yard) |
'A' Shop: D602/4, D805/11/28/70, D1000-11, D2137, D2372-9, D3257, D3431, D3744, D6306/11/9, 13186, 13264/5, 15100/2, 2829, 3817/43, 4090, 4922/8/56/78, 5000/1/31/49/60, 5306/51, 5903/4/36/9/67, 6000/4/7, 6363/95, 6871, 6919/46/59/86/97/8, 7020, 7209/15/21/2, 7826, 82031, 92226/34. Works Yard: D804/15/23/41/51/2, D2188/9/94, 1604/34/47, 2516, 3667/70, 3822/41, 4003, 4203, 4916/98, 5015/80/1, 5103/10/76/7/95, 5336, 5949, 6027, 6349, 6831, 6969, 7745/56/75/98, 8789/98, 9400/14, 9749, 78001/8. 92215/45. Triangle: 6021, 9736/67. Dump: 1361/2/4/6, 1419/33, 3657/76, 3724, 6426, 7700/61, 8429, 8705/22/40/77/96, 9735/62/71/81. 'C' Shop: 8457 intact, Outside 'C' Shop: 5771, 8726 being cut up. |
SLS/196109 |
17/09/1961 |
Swindon Works (Works Sidings) |
'A' Shop: D604, D816/7/21/3/5/43/70, D3431, D6306/8/21, 2866, 3852, 4003/79/81/7/9, D1000-11, D2379-83, 4117, 4707, 4904/26/33/43/66/79/92/8, 5018/38/74/92, 5208, 5380, 6021/6, 6808/16/25/32/4/40, 6948, 7018/28, 7219, 7825, 7905/21, 13115/84/6, 13259/65, 92215/26. Works Sidings: D820, D2086, D2143/4, D2378, D7000, 1009, 3670, 3839/59, 4100, 4917/8/83, 5000/78, 5951/98, 6014/6/9/27, 6964/87/96, 7200, 7756/75, 7909, 8721, 9400, 9749, 73027, 78008, 92241/5. Triangle: 1640, 5087, 5198, 5516, 5934/75, 8762/72/87, 9751, 13355. Dump: 1361/6, 1433, 1604, 5318, 6720, 7745/98, 8429, 8740/74/7/89, 9735/6/67. 'C' Shop: 4203, 5110/95. Outside Stock Shed: D806, D4025, D6303, 4948, 5815, 6900. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: D801. Gasworks : Nil. |
SLS/196111 |
12/11/1961 |
Swindon Works |
'A' Shop: D603, D825/32/56, D1000-12, D2175-7, D2383/4, D3032, D6320, 1010/15/24, 2832, 4003/82/92/5, 4706, 4903/18/32/76/89, 5073/8/87/96/8, 5974/6, 6014/26/8, 6345, 6826/45, 6909/33/55/81, 7015/21/2/34, 7232, 7322 (being cut up), 7805, 7915, 9400, 13115, 13353/5/62, 15100, 73027, 82004/35, 92233/41/5. Works Sidings: L90, 8, 1006/23, 2215, 3838/9, 4075/83, 4207, 4945, 5071, 5950/98, 6019, 6309/29/38, 6820, 6915/64, 7002, 7901/17, 8787, 9705, 75005, 78008, 92212. Triangle: 1606/15, 4563/5, 5039, 5538, 6415, 6993, 7417, 7787, 8772, 9739. Dump: 1433, 5332, 6700, 8706, 9745/9. 'C' Shop: 6392, 7775 intact. Outside Stock Shed: 5815, 6357, 6900. Weigh House: 5938/55. Outside Weigh House: D831/53, D6303, D7010. Works Shunters: 5756/80, 7756, 8721/62. |
SLS/196201 |