Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 484 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19395 Week
» 84349 Month
» 287013 Year
» 3313866 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
7770 |
m/e |
02/1931 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1931 |
GLO |
|
Gloucester Horton Road |
4w/e |
07/03/1936 |
TDU |
|
Tondu |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/04/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/04/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1931 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 7770 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24058 |
|
|
07/03/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (GLO) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tondu (TDU) |
|
|
21/04/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7770 |
|
|
06/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|