Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 4 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5348 Week
» 6238 Month
» 314219 Year
» 1198600 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 78063 m/e 11/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 2
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 11/1956 to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/12/1966
Scrapping During 09/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 10 yrs, 1 mth , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
27D Wigan Central (L&Y) (New) m/e 11/1956
1A Willesden w/e 25/05/1963
5E Nuneaton w/e 02/10/1965
6D Shrewsbury w/e 23/04/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 10/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 10/11/1956
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 5E Nuneaton 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 4w/e 07/05/1966
WDN   w/e 10/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1956 To Service To service as BR Number 78063
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)
   
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 78063    
09/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev