Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 324 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 324 Week
» 7508 Month
» 315489 Year
» 1199870 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7909   20/01/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
01/1950 HEVENINGHAM HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class Modified Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Thu 20/01/1950
Withdrawal Thu 18/11/1965
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 15 yrs, 9 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83D Laira 4w/e 20/05/1950
82D Westbury 4w/e 04/10/1958
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 05/11/1960
83D Laira 4w/e 06/10/1962
83B Taunton 2w/e 17/11/1962
83C Westbury 6w/e 12/10/1964
85A Worcester w/e 15/11/1964
81F Oxford 4w/e 11/07/1965
   Withdrawn 18/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/01/1950
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 20/05/1950
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 05/11/1960
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 83B Taunton 2w/e 17/11/1962
ALLOC 83C Westbury 3w/e 05/10/1964
ALLOC 85A Worcester w/e 09/11/1964
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 11/07/1965
WDN   18/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/01/1950 To Service To service as GWR Number 7909
Built at Swindon Works
   
20/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (83C)    
15/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
18/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 7909    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev